Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pfarr, Timothy R., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Nonye Ugorji, against Dignity Health, Does 1-50, Prasad, M.D., Praveen, Ridgeway, M.D., Michael, represented by Bruce E Salenko, Dennis P Mcpherson, John Quincy Brown, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Answer (to Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: January 28, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: January 28, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: January 24, 2020Answer filed.
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to defendant Dignity Health dba Mercy General Hospital ONLY) filed.
Date: February 19, 2020Answer filed.
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed.
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.