Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In Re Mitchell Cory McKelvy
On April 30, 2019 a petitions - other case was filed by Soto, David, and Mitchell, Cortre, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 30, 2019
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Status
Other
Case Duration
1 month and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/17/2019 09:00:00 AM . |
|
June 17, 2019 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Christopher E. Krueger |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted . | |
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name has been Granted . | |
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name filed. |
|
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication filed. |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 06/17/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Christopher E. Krueger |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed. |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed. |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 54 .
Judge: Christopher E. Krueger |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Mitchell, Cortre Application for Waiver granted in full on 04/30/2019. | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Mitchell, Cortre Application for Waiver granted in full on 04/30/2019 . |