Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Artic Horizon, Baxter Bailey & Associates Inc Assignee, Cargo Speed, Delta Trucking, Dtl Transport, (total of 15) See All filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Richard L Grant, against Dairiconcepts Lp, Dairy Farmers Of America Inc, Hp Hood Llc, Morton Salt Inc, Polar Transport Inc, (total of 6) See All represented by Landon D Bailey, Leslie Werlin, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Thadd A. Blizzard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: May 06, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 05, 2020Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: March 09, 2020Answer (to Caomplaint) filed.
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Further Case Management and Order to Show Cause Hearing) filed.
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: April 02, 2020Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: May 06, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.