Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Schuman, Robert L., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Edward C Meara, against Does 1-10, Rick, Robin S., Singh, Kuljit, represented by Kyle W Memmott, Robert F Bennett, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Laurie M. Earl presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: May 18, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: October 18, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: October 22, 2019Answer (to Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed.
Date: October 22, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.