Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by West Imboden, against Gutierrez, Ana R., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Proposed Order filed.
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Limited Civil Case Status Memorandum filed.
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Trial filed.
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Limited Civil Case Status Memorandum filed.
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Trial filed.
Date: February 10, 2020Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: February 10, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: April 01, 2020Notice of Trial filed.
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.