Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Martin, Renee L., filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Deutsche National Bank Trust Company As Trustee For Long Beach Mortgage Loan 2004-3 Asset Backed Certificates Series 2004-3, Does 1-30, Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc, Phh Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Austin B Kenney, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Opposition (to Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Application - Other (for Reconsideration) filed.
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Reconsideration) filed.
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Proposed Order (for Additional Time to File Re: Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jason M Julian ISO Opp to Ex Parte App) filed.
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: May 28, 2020Demurrer (To Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed.
Date: May 15, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint filed.
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Opposition) filed.
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (ISO Oppo) filed.
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Demurrer Party Re Meet and Confer) filed.
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Opposition (Defendants Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: May 15, 2020Declaration - Other (of plfs ISO Request for Reconsideration) filed.
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Reply (ISO Demurrer to Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Answer (To Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (ISO Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration filed.
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint (Second) filed.
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte App for TRO and OSC) filed.
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Reply (ISO Demurrer to 2nd Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: May 06, 2020Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (ISO Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for TRO) filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Demurrer (to Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Hearing filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (ISO TRO Re: Trustee Sale) filed.
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Summons submitted by Martin, Renee L rejected on 05/30/2019 .
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Monetary Status filed.
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Meet and Confer) filed.
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (amended) filed.
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Application - Other (for temporary restraining order and request for an order to shorten time) filed.
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of plf notice to defs) filed.
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (facts regarding case) filed.
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (Amended) filed.
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (That court was closed on 11/11/19) filed.
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 01/15/2020 11:33:00 AM .
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: May 15, 2020Declaration - Other (Declaration of moving party) filed.
Date: May 15, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.