Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Crespo, Ava Rose, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 24, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time113 days |
Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.
Date: May 13, 2019Proposed Order to Deposit filed.
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed.
Date: May 13, 2019Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: May 16, 2019Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: July 11, 2019Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed.
Date: August 15, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.