Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Golnaz Heidari, against Barnaby, Adam, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions116 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Declaration - Other (Case Summary) filed.
Date: June 27, 2019Request - Court Judgment filed.
Date: June 27, 2019Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 1033(b)) filed.
Date: June 27, 2019Declaration - Other (CCP 585(a)) filed.
Date: June 27, 2019Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: March 10, 2020Declaration - Other (Affidavit of Military Status) filed.
Date: June 27, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.