Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bui, Vince, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against The City Of Sacramento, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Steven M. Gevercer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven M. Gevercer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions427 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: March 02, 2020Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: October 11, 2019Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: March 05, 2020Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.
Date: December 31, 2018Notice of Case Assignment Sac generated .
Date: December 31, 2018Case initiation form printed .
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: March 28, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: March 02, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.