Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Family Health Center of San Diego vs. Department of Health Care Services
On August 13, 2018 a writ of mandate case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Steven M. Gevercer presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 13, 2018
Last Refreshed
May 14, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Case Duration
1 year
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Return of Adminstrative Record) filed. |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Second Amended Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Default |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | 3DCA Appeal not Selected Notice |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment (Denying Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed. |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Denied . | |
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Petition for Writ of Mandate has been Denied . | |
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment filed. |
|
March 29, 2019 | Tentative Ruling | SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF SACRAMENTO DATE/TIME: March 29 2019 11:00 a.m. DEP. NO.: 27 JUDGE: HON. STEVEN M. GEVERCER CLERK: D. WARD FAMILY HEALTH CENTERS OF SAN DIEGO, Case No. 34-2018-80...
Judge: STEVEN M. GEVERCER |
|
March 29, 2019 | hearing |
Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate Heard Judge: Steven M. Gevercer |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate heard on 03/29/2019 11:00:00 AM . |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling Filed |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Family Health Centers of San Diego v. Dept. of Health Care Services--tentative ruling on Petition for Writ of Mandate |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing filed. |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate scheduled for 03/29/2019 at 11:00:00 AM in Department 27 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Steven M. Gevercer |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate rescheduled to 03/29/2019 at 11:00:00 AM in Department 27 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Steven M. Gevercer |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Stipulation and Order to COntinue Hearing on Petitioner's Writ of Mandate) filed. |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition (to Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed. |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer filed. |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed. |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Request - Judicial Notice (ISO Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed. |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing filed. |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Lodging (of Administrative Record) filed. |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed. |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate scheduled for 03/15/2019 at 11:00:00 AM in Department 27 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Steven M. Gevercer |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition for Writ of Mandate filed. |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 27 .
Judge: Steven M. Gevercer |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Case initiation form printed . |
|