We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Williams, Dana ,
filed a(n)
Harassment -
Torts
case
against
Scott, Nadasha Lafontaine ,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
December 31, 2018
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Last Refreshed
October 22, 2021
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
50 days
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Defendants
Scott, Nadasha Lafontaine
Case Events for
Williams, Dana v. Scott, Nadasha Lafontaine
Date
Type
Description
February 19, 2019
Docket Event
Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders has been Dismissed .
February 19, 2019
Docket Event
Minute Order 2/15/19
Get Document
February 19, 2019
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed .
February 15, 2019
Hearing
Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment Scheduled
January 25, 2019
Hearing
Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment Heard
January 25, 2019
Docket Event
Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment scheduled for 02/15/2019 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 1 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
January 25, 2019
Docket Event
1/25/19 M.O.
Get Document
December 31, 2018
Docket Event
Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment scheduled for 01/25/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 1 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
December 31, 2018
Docket Event
Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed.
Get Document
December 31, 2018
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order filed.
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.