Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Munguia, Natacha, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Lopez, Gustavo, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 13, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time95 days |
10/19/18 Minute Order
Date: October 19, 2018Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed.
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order filed.
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:008/7/18 Minute Order
Date: September 07, 2018per MO
Date: November 16, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.