Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Xxxxxx-Xxxxxxx, Xxxxxx, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Xxxxxx, Xxxxxxxxxx, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 13, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time175 days |
Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: September 20, 2018Order - Other (Order Granting Motion for Attorney's Fees) filed.
Date: February 04, 2019Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order filed.
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00per MO
Date: September 28, 2018Response filed.
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed.
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:008/7/18 Minute Order
Date: September 07, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.