Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tariel, Lauren, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Waldo, Barbara Ann, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 13, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time46 days |
per MO
Date: September 28, 2018Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order filed.
Date: August 13, 2018Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed.
Date: August 13, 2018Response filed.
Date: September 27, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:009/7/18 Minute Order
Date: September 07, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.