Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rodriguez Nunez, Ana C., filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Hernandez, Roberto, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 01, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions58 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Case Cycle Time58 days |
Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.
Date: August 16, 2018Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order filed.
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Mediation Agreement
Date: September 28, 2018Proof of Service (Proof of Unsuccessful Service) filed.
Date: September 07, 201809/28/18 Minute Order
Date: September 28, 2018Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed.
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Request - Other (Request to Continue Court Hearing) filed.
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Order - Other (CH-116) filed.
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:009/7/18 Minute Order
Date: September 07, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.