Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Janet L Brown, against Does 1-10, Duchene, Erin A., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time291 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: October 18, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: February 07, 2019Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: August 19, 2019Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: March 25, 2019Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: March 25, 2019Summons filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.