Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Janet L Brown, against Calliesmaine, Virginia G., Does 1-10, represented by Stanley R Apps, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions354 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time365 days |
Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: April 04, 2019Complaint filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: December 20, 2019Answer (To Complaint) filed.
Date: February 28, 2019Stipulation filed.
Date: April 04, 2019Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: January 30, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.