Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nationwide Insurance Company Of America, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Susan M Benson, against Svistun, Ivan, Svistun, Daniel Nikolaevich, Does I Through V, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions134 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other filed.
Date: March 16, 2020Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Order - Other (Granting Stipulation to Vacate Judgment and Dismiss Action) filed.
Date: March 19, 2020Summons filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (In Support of Default Judgment CCP 585(d)) filed.
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Re: Superior Court Filing) filed.
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.