Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Elizabeth A Bleier, against Does 1-5, Walker, Morgan C., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions101 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time204 days |
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: April 11, 2019Summons filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: April 11, 2019Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: July 23, 2019Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: April 11, 2019Declaration - Other (Non-Military Status) filed.
Date: April 11, 2019Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: April 11, 2019Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: June 21, 2019Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCp 1033(b)) filed.
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 585) filed.
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.