Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gavia, Wendy R., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Steve B Mikhov, against Does 1-10, Volkswagen Group Of America Inc, represented by Michael A Carlin, Sean P Conboy, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Thadd A. Blizzard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThadd A. Blizzard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/02/2019 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Carlin iso Demurrer and Mtn to Strke) filed.
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for an Order Staying Proceedings) filed.
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed.
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/03/2019 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/09/2019 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: February 19, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to Pltfs Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 07/09/2019 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Michael Carlin in support of Def Demurrer and Mtn to Strike) filed.
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike) filed.
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination (Amended) filed.
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Reply (Def reply in support of its demurer to plaintiffs complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (ISO Def Demurrer and Motion to Strike) filed.
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Strike Pltfs Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination filed.
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike) filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike (Plaintiffs Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/03/2019 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint) filed.
Date: December 30, 2019Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/10/2019 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Demurrer (To Plaintiffs Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Reply (Defs Reply in support of its Mtn to stirke plaintiffs complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge and Setting Hearing Date) filed.
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Kim) filed.
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Hearing filed.
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Order - Other (Order GRANTING Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore) filed.
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.