Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Laluan, Demetrio, Laluan, Evelyn, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Steve B Mikhov, against Does 1-10, Elk Grove Auto Group Inc, Fca Us Llc, represented by Jon D Universal, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time192 days |
Answer (To Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 27, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 26, 2019Demand for Jury Trial filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.
Date: June 26, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.