Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Shiv Samtani, against Kern, Jennifer L., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions50 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time310 days |
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Case Summary) filed.
Date: May 13, 2019Complaint filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Request - Court Judgment filed.
Date: May 13, 2019Summons filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 1033(b)) filed.
Date: May 13, 2019Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: July 30, 2019Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 585(a)) filed.
Date: May 13, 2019Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: November 06, 2019Declaration - Other (Affidavit of Military Status) filed.
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.