Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Shiv Samtani, against Carbajal, Daniel M., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions157 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time235 days |
Judgment (Stipulated Judgment) filed.
Date: June 06, 2019Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (for Judgment) filed.
Date: May 24, 2019Statement of Venue filed.
Date: December 31, 2018Complaint filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: May 24, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: January 24, 2019Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: August 23, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.