Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Shiv Samtani, against Dhillon, Kittu, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions183 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Case Summary) filed.
Date: September 26, 2019Complaint filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Request - Court Judgment filed.
Date: September 26, 2019Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (In Support of Default Judgment Under CCP 585) filed.
Date: September 26, 2019Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: March 13, 2020Declaration - Other (Re: Affidavit of Military Status) filed.
Date: September 26, 2019Declaration - Other (Pursuant of CCP 1033(b)) filed.
Date: September 26, 2019Declaration - Other (Attorney Fee Declaration CCP 585(a)) filed.
Date: September 26, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.