Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kononov, Viktor, Kononov, Larisa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Robert D Borcyckowski, against Ketsavong, Vinyo, Does 1 Through 30, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions94 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time151 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: January 25, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Default denied as to Ketsavong, Vinyo on Complaint .
Date: November 26, 2018Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: November 29, 2018Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: December 03, 2018Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: October 09, 2018Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: November 26, 2018Request for Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: January 25, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.