Dority, Paul,
filed a(n)
Economic Torts -
Torts
case
against
Morgan, Michelle,
Morgan, Dusty,
Morgan, Alycia,
Does 1 To 50 Inclusive,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Dority, Paul v. Morgan, Michelle
, et al.
Case Events for
Dority, Paul v. Morgan, Michelle
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
January 09, 2020
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program Heard
January 09, 2020
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program heard on 01/09/2020 08:30:00 AM .
January 09, 2020
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/06/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Order to Show Cause in RE: Dismissal has been generated .
January 09, 2020
Docket Event
The Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program is scheduled for 08/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 43.
January 09, 2020
Docket Event
Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
January 06, 2020
Docket Event
Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 01/09/2020 08:30:00 AM published .
January 06, 2020
Tentative Ruling
Mandatory appearance of Attorney for Plaintiff or Plaintiff In Pro Per is required. Absent an appearance for any matter on the Order to Show Cause Re: Non Compliance could result in dismissal without ...
Judge: Kevin R. Culhane
January 02, 2020
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program heard on 01/02/2020 08:30:00 AM .
January 02, 2020
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/09/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Order to Show Cause in RE: Non-Compliance has been generated .
January 02, 2020
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program rescheduled to 01/09/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .