Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kergan, Jo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Seth R. Bradley, against Donahue, Michelle K., Does 1-25, represented by Randee M Sandlin, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 22, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions364 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time377 days |
Answer filed.
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: July 19, 2019Complaint filed.
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: August 21, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.