Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Long, Christopher, Ming, Joseph, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Myles Taylor, against Belmonte, Ernesto, Dias, Paul, Does 1-50, Magnelan Partners Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Magnelan Pascal Partners Llc Nevada Limited Liability Company, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts Superior with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 22, 2018 |
Category(Fraud (No Contract)) |
|
Last RefreshedJune 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions168 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time170 days |
This complaint alleges breach of oral contract, and fraud, deceit, and unfair practices
(Breach of Oral Contract and Fraud, Deceit, and Unfair Practices) by Christopher Long and
Joseph Ming (plaintiffs) against Oelofse, Dias, Revair, TNBC, Magnelan E...
Summons
Date: August 22, 2018Complaint
Date: August 22, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 21, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 22, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: February 07, 2019Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: August 23, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: February 06, 2019Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: August 23, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 21, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 22, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: February 07, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: February 06, 2019Summons
Date: August 22, 2018Complaint
Date: August 22, 2018Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: February 06, 2019Complaint filed.
Date: August 22, 2018Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: September 21, 2018Summons filed.
Date: August 22, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: August 22, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.