Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Heath, Malissa A., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Does 1-10, Burton, Scott Douglas, Burton, Rich, Burton, Mary Anne, represented by Tina Ann Bell, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 22, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions378 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time387 days |
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: September 04, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Stipulation for Settlement; Order
Date: August 09, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Request - Other (Request for VSC) filed.
Date: July 22, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed.
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference - Settled filed.
Date: August 09, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.