Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mount, Cory Lee, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Karen L. Wallace, Payam Shahian, against Does 1 Through 10, Fca Us Llc, Stockton Dodge Inc, represented by Roger G. Perkins, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 10, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of Ruling filed.
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Ogata iso Motion to compel) filed.
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Correspondence (Letter requesting continuance from 4/24/19 to 5/9/19-GRTD) filed.
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation and Protective Order for Protection of Confidential Information) filed.
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: January 23, 2020Motion to Compel - Other (Further Responses) submitted by Mount, Cory Lee rejected on 04/16/2019 .
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to Motion to Compel Requests for Production of Documents) filed.
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Further Responses to Request for Production of Docs) filed.
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Statement - Other (ISO Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents) filed.
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Errata (re proposed order granting plf mtn to compel) filed.
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/09/2019 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/24/2019 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: May 28, 2020Order - Other (Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint) filed.
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Order - Other (Order GRANTING Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/28/2019 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Statement - Other (Sep Statement iso Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Nguyen) filed.
Date: May 29, 2020Declaration - Other (of Shahian) filed.
Date: May 28, 2020Motion for Attorney Fees filed.
Date: May 28, 2020Paper Exhibits (Index of Exhibits) filed.
Date: May 28, 2020Declaration - Other (of Shahian) filed.
Date: May 29, 2020Declaration - Other (of Nguyen) filed.
Date: May 28, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.