Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jackson, Qualique, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Russell L. Hom presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 03, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time349 days |
Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed.
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed.
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed.
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Petition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account filed.
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Order For Withdrawal Of Funds From Blocked Account
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Petition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account filed.
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Order For Withdrawal Of Funds From Blocked Account
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Petition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account filed.
Date: November 30, 2018Order For Withdrawal Of Funds From Blocked Account
Date: November 30, 2018Petition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account filed.
Date: January 02, 2019Order For Withdrawal Of Funds From Blocked Account
Date: January 07, 2019Petition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account filed.
Date: February 05, 2019Order For Withdrawal Of Funds From Blocked Account (Denied)
Date: February 08, 2019Petition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account filed.
Date: April 26, 2019Order For Withdrawal Of Funds From Blocked Account
Date: April 30, 2019Petition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account filed.
Date: June 07, 2019Order For Withdrawal Of Funds From Blocked Account
Date: June 17, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.