Macklin Jr, Jason,
Trammell, Raven,
filed a(n)
General Torts -
Torts
case
represented by
Ilan N Rosen Janfaza,
against
Conam Management Corporation,
Does 1-20,
Singh, Sushil,
The Terminix International Company Limited Liability Partnership,
Willow Glen Apartment Homes,
(total of 5)
See All
represented by
Anders R. Morrison,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Details for
Macklin Jr, Jason v. Conam Management Corporation
, et al.
Case Events for
Macklin Jr, Jason v. Conam Management Corporation
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
June 04, 2020
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program Scheduled
Judge: Gerrit W. Wood
March 24, 2020
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program Heard
Judge: Gerrit W. Wood
March 24, 2020
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program heard on 03/24/2020 04:25:17 PM .
March 24, 2020
Docket Event
Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
March 18, 2020
Docket Event
Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 04/02/2020 08:30:00 AM published .
March 18, 2020
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program rescheduled to 06/04/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Gerrit W. Wood
March 18, 2020
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/04/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Order to Show Cause in RE: Non-Compliance has been generated .
Judge: Gerrit W. Wood
March 18, 2020
Tentative Ruling
Notice Regarding Civil Cases Scheduled in Dept. 31 of the Sacramento Superior Court on the CMC calendar scheduled for Thursday, April 2, 2020 This Notice is to inform you that due to the Emergency Ord...
Judge: Gerrit W. Wood
February 18, 2020
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
February 13, 2020
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program Heard