Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael S Hunt, against Kelly, Susan, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions185 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Stipulation filed.
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: June 30, 2020Request for Dismissal (CCP 664.6) filed.
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Request to Vacate Dismissal) filed.
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) filed.
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Judgment filed.
Date: September 17, 2018Order - Other (Setting aside July 2, 2018 Dismissal) filed.
Date: September 17, 2018Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Notice - Other filed.
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE Default under Stip) filed.
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: December 17, 2018Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: December 26, 2018Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: September 30, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.