Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael S Hunt, against Tarver, Kathy, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions108 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time640 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: May 24, 2018Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (ccp 1033) filed.
Date: April 16, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: April 16, 2018Summons filed.
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: April 16, 2018Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: September 30, 2019Writ of Execution Issued
Date: October 31, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.