Maroofi, Abbas,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
W Sterling Rouston-Thomas,
against
Shergil, Sharen,
Drr World Llc,
Does 1-10,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Thadd A. Blizzard presiding.
Case Details for
Maroofi, Abbas v. Shergil, Sharen
, et al.
Case Events for
Maroofi, Abbas v. Shergil, Sharen
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
March 12, 2020
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt - Case Management Program Scheduled
Judge: Thadd A. Blizzard
March 09, 2020
Docket Event
Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt - Case Management Program set on 03/12/2020 08:30:00 AM published .
March 09, 2020
Tentative Ruling
Mandatory appearance of Attorney for Plaintiff or Plaintiff In Pro Per is required. Please note that case scheduled for a CMC Thursday 8:30 A.M. in Department 23 on or after January 10,2020 will be he...
Judge: Thadd A. Blizzard
January 27, 2020
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/12/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Order to Show Cause for Failure to Comply has been generated .
Judge: Thadd A. Blizzard
November 07, 2019
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program Heard
November 07, 2019
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program heard on 11/07/2019 08:30:00 AM .
November 07, 2019
Docket Event
Court orders sanctions against W Sterling Rouston-Thomas in the sum of $ 150.00, payable to Court by 03/05/2020. Counsel failed to file a case management statement.
November 07, 2019
Docket Event
The Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt - Case Management Program is scheduled for 03/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 23.
November 07, 2019
Docket Event
Court orders sanctions against W Sterling Rouston-Thomas in the sum of $ 150.00, payable to Court by 03/05/2020. Counsel failed to appear when mandatory appearance was required.
November 07, 2019
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/12/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Order to Show Cause for Failure to Comply has been generated .