Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gonzalez, Rachel, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher E. Krueger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time189 days |
Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed.
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed.
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name filed.
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Publication filed.
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: July 05, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: July 05, 2018Decree Changing Name filed.
Date: July 06, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.