Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Murphy, Megan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Travis G Black, against Trimble, Tessa Marie, Does 1-25, represented by John S Woller, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Benjamin G. Davidian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin G. Davidian Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2017 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions788 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time930 days |
Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Proposed Order (for Publication of Summons) filed.
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Order - Other filed.
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: March 15, 2019Application for Order for Publication of Summons filed.
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/06/2018 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Statement - Other (of Issues Regarding Motion for Sanctions) filed.
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal submitted by Murphy, Megan rejected on 07/31/2019 .
Date: July 31, 2019Motion - Other (to Enforce Court Order Issue and Evidentiary Sanctions) filed.
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Order - Other (Order for Publication of Summons) filed.
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Opposition (AND NON OPPO TO MOTION TO ENFORCE ORDER) filed.
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Travis Black in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice - Other (to Enforce Court Order RE Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Mtn to Compel) filed.
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Correspondence (Return document form: Order for Publication of summons) filed.
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Publication filed.
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Affidavit - Other (of reasonable diligence) filed.
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Order - Other (Clerk's Return Document Letter) filed.
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Statement - Other (Issues Regarding Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses) filed.
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Further Responses to Discovery, Memo of Points and Auth) filed.
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Reply (to Defs Opposition RE Motion to Compel Further Responses to Discovery) filed.
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Settlement Conference generated .
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Correspondence (Confirming Letter - 3/5/19 hearing dropped from calendar) filed.
Date: March 11, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.