Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Swallow, Eric G., filed a(n) Civil case against California Gambling Control Commission, California Department Of Justice, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Allen H. Sumner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions951 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1270 days |
Order - Other (Minute Order Dated 01/26/2018 RE Order and Notice Resigning Case) filed.
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Order - Other (Ruling re Potentially Privileged Documents Submitted by DOJ for In Camera Review) filed.
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Tentative Ruling on Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: June 10, 20193DCA Appeal not Selected Notice
Date: June 03, 2019Correspondence (Letter to Dept 31) filed.
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (in Support of Motion To Augment Record Before the Court (volume 3 of 6)) filed.
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application for Supplemental Briefing) filed.
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Supplemental - Other (Reply in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of William Torngren in Support of Opposition to Motion) filed.
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Motion - Other (for Writ of Mandate) filed.
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:003DCA order granting request
Date: January 07, 2020Paper Exhibits (Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2017-12-13T00:00:00Trial Brief (Brief in Response to Court Order) filed.
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Correspondence (Letter dated 03/01/2017 RE 03/03/2017 Motions) filed.
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Granting Ex Parte Application to Extend Page Limit) filed.
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Answer (to Petition) filed.
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Motion to Quash Subpoena filed.
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Order - Other (Order and Notice of Reassignment) filed.
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (to Extend Page Limit) filed.
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal
Date: May 06, 2019Paper Exhibits (in Support of Motion To Augment Record Before the Court (volume 2 of 6)) filed.
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion to Augment Record) filed.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Opposition to Motion to Quash) filed.
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Swallow v. California Gambling Control Commission, tentative ruling on motion to augment
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (Permiting Filing of Supplemental Memo of P & A's) filed.
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of William P Torngren In Support of Respondent's Reply RE: Motion to Quash) filed.
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Reply (MPA in Support of Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Amended Petition (1st) filed.
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Bart E Hightower in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed.
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (in Support of Motion To Augment Record Before the Court (volume 6 of 6))) filed.
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Order - Other (In Camera Review Order) filed.
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Tentative Ruling on Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to Request to Augment Administrative Record) filed.
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Objection (to Proposed Order Re: Motion to Quash) filed.
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Appendix) filed.
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Objection (to Request for Judicial Notice) filed.
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Writ of Mandate) filed.
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Opposition (Corrected Oppo to Mtn to Augment Courts Record) filed.
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Request to Augment Amin Record) filed.
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (in Support of Motion To Augment Record Before the Court (volume 4 of 6))) filed.
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Writ of Mandate heard on 08/17/2018 01:30:00 PM .
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Swallow v. California Gambling Control Commission, tentative ruling on motion to compel
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Bart E Hightower in Support of Opposition to Motion) filed.
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Joinder in Opposition (to Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Opposition to Motion) filed.
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Motion - Other (To Augment Record Before the Court) filed.
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte Application for Stay - Writ of Mandate heard on 05/24/2017 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed.
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Tentative Ruling Filed
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Correspondence (Letter Dated 06/20/2017 RE Proposed Order) filed.
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Order - Other (Peremptory Writ of Mandate) filed.
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Writ of Mandate heard on 01/13/2017 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Sa'id Vakili in Support of Request for Judicial Notice) filed.
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of William P Torngren in Support of Supplemental Reply) filed.
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Tentative Ruling Filed
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Notice - Other (Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Joinder in Supplemental Reply in Support of Motion to Quash) filed.
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Reply (Respondent's Reply In Support of Motion to Quash) filed.
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Proposed Order (Denying Ex Parte Application) filed.
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00Swallow v. Cal. Gambling Control Comm'n - Motion to Quash
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate heard on 11/02/2018 10:30:00 AM .
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Order - Other (Judgment Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed.
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Response (To Proposed Order) filed.
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Supplemental - Other (Declaration of William P Torngren in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Writ of Mandate heard on 04/20/2018 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application for Stay) filed.
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (For Order) filed.
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Objections to Request for Judicial Notice) filed.
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Swallow v. California Gambling Control Commission, tentative ruling on petition for writ of mandate
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of William P Torngren in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte Application - Other - Writ of Mandate heard on 06/13/2017 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed.
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (in Support of Motion To Augment Record Before the Court Volume 1 of 6)) filed.
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Bart E Hightower in Support of Ex Parte Application to Extend Page Limit) filed.
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed.
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (in Support of Motion To Augment Record Before the Court (volume 5 of 6))) filed.
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Swallow v. California Gambling Control - Motion to Quash
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of William P Torngren in Support of Opposition to Motion) filed.
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion) filed.
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing filed.
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Case initiation form printed .
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena) filed.
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Swallow v. California Gambling Control - Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard on 04/14/2017 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Correspondence (Letter dated 04/07/2017 RE Case Status) filed.
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard on 03/03/2017 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Paper Exhibits filed.
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Correspondence (Letter dated 05/30/2017RE Motion to Quash the Deposition Subpoena Duces Tecum) filed.
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Statement - Other (Certificate of Service) filed.
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00Order After Hearing (Denying Petitioner's Ex Parte Application for Stay) filed.
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard on 06/21/2017 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Unavailability of Counsel) filed.
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Sa'id Wakili Certifying) filed.
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 03/09/2018 10:20:00 AM .
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Declaration of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed.
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Order After Hearing (Order Granting Motion to Compel in Part and Denying in Part) filed.
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Order - Other (Order re Service) filed.
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Attachment - Other (Provisional Document # 1 to Augment Amin Record) filed.
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Admin Records) filed.
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Supplementing Previously Filed Administrative Record) filed.
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Order After Hearing filed.
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Receipt - Other (Acknowledgment and Receipt of Administrative Record) filed.
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Peremptory Writ of Mandate) filed.
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:003DCA return receipt for RT
Date: September 17, 2019Sa'Id Vakili return receipt for RT
Date: September 13, 2019Notice of Default
Date: June 17, 2019Notice of Filling of Designation and Notice to Reporters to Prepare Transcripts
Date: June 26, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.