Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Td Service Company, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Lawrence J Dreyfuss, against Johnson, Michael, Johnson, Corrine, Does 1-50, Cach Llc, represented by Steven R Matulich, Sean M Patrick, Ryan E Vos, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2016 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions427 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time427 days |
Answer filed.
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2017-03-21T00:00:00Judgment (by stipulation and order to distribute funds) filed.
Date: December 01, 2017Complaint in Interpleader filed.
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Related Case filed.
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Motion - Other (for Discharge and Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs) filed.
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Reply (Upon Non Opposition to Motion for Discharge & Award of Attny Fees) filed.
Date: 2017-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Order - Other (Order for Discharge and Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs) filed.
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Returned Check Notice (Sacramento) generated .
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.