Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Petition of Manureet Brar Dhillon
On September 30, 2016 a petitions - other case was filed by Dhillon, Manureet Brar, and Dhillon, Amarjot, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Raymond M. Cadei presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 30, 2016
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Case Duration
3 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/20/2017 09:00:00 AM . |
|
January 20, 2017 |
Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
||
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted . | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name filed. |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name has been Granted . | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication filed. |
|
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 01/20/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed. |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed. |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 54 .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|