Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stadler Maher Llc A Nevada Limited Liability Company, Maher, Patrick, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Weinstein, David, Elizarov, Avner, Does 1-50, American Md, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Laurie M. Earl presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 18, 2016 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed.
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Correspondence (Order for Publication of Summons Rejection) filed.
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Application for Order for Publication of Summons filed.
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Order on Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed.
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Matthew M Breining ISO Exparte App) filed.
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to Select Trial Date and Mandatory Settlement Conference Date filed.
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed.
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Order Granting Attorneys Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed.
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed.
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: August 22, 2019Correspondence (returned minute order) filed.
Date: September 17, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.