Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Rodriguez, Tehani, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Robert C Bowman, Jr, against Department Of Transportation, Does 1-50, represented by Navtej Bassi, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts Superior with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2016 |
Category(Other Employment Complaint Case) |
|
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions178 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time231 days |
This is an employment discrimination complaint filed on behalf of Tehani Rodriguez by the Law Offices of Bowman & Associates. It is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento. Rodriguez is alleging discrimination, harassment, and...
Notice
Date: February 23, 2016Tentative Ruling
Date: August 11, 2016Answer
Date: March 28, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: August 03, 2016Request for Dismissal
Date: August 19, 2016Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Denied
Date: March 07, 2016Request for Dismissal
Date: September 16, 2016Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Denied
Date: February 03, 2016Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 29, 2016Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: February 01, 2016Complaint
Date: January 29, 2016Summons
Date: January 29, 2016Request for Dismissal
Date: July 25, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 29, 2016Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Denied) filed.
Date: March 07, 2016Case Management Statement filed.
Date: August 03, 2016Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: August 19, 2016Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: July 25, 2016Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Denied) filed.
Date: February 03, 2016Complaint filed.
Date: January 29, 2016Answer filed.
Date: March 28, 2016Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: February 29, 2016Request to Waive Court Fee (FW-001) submitted by Rodriguez, Tehani rejected on 02/23/2016 .
Date: February 23, 2016Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: September 16, 2016Summons filed.
Date: January 29, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: January 29, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.