Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tolbert-Montenegro, Jordana A., Willis, Danette L., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Christopher M. Lovasz, against Does 1-20, Ford Motor Company, Performance Automatice Group, Inc., represented by Stephen H Dye, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2016 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions262 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time269 days |
Stipulation and Order for Use of Private Alternative Dispute Resolution filed.
Date: September 07, 2016Order on Stipulation and Order to Mediation filed.
Date: September 22, 2016Notice - Other (Notice of Tentative Ruling) filed.
Date: August 25, 2016Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00Order on Stipulation and Order to Mediation filed.
Date: August 25, 2016Complaint filed.
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: October 11, 2016Answer filed.
Date: 2016-03-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: October 17, 2016Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference) filed.
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.