Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Short, Michael, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by William L Brelsford, against Agrawal, Bella, Does 1-50, Flores, Joseph, Gaddis, Alfred, Mdstat Urgent Care, (total of 6) See All represented by Michele Raley, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Benjamin G. Davidian presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2016 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions538 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Cycle Time550 days |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: August 01, 2017Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: July 20, 2017Complaint filed.
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Trial filed.
Date: May 01, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.