Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
California Department Of Water Resources, San Diego Gas & Electric Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by C Larry Davis, Kamala Devi Harris, against Chevron Corporation, Chevron Power Holdings Inc, Does 1-50, Nrg Energy Inc, Sunrise Power Company Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by C Larry Davis, Edward C Duckers, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2016 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions474 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Motion - Other (for Leave to Add New Cause of Action to Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Edward C Duckers in Support of 30 Day Extension of Time) filed.
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Def Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Response (to Separate Statement in support of its Opposition) filed.
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in support of mtn to compel) filed.
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulated Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (req foe production of dcos, set one) filed.
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Correspondence (Letter requesting continuance from 3/27/17 to 4/24/17-GRTD) filed.
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Proposed Order (Stipulated Protective) filed.
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Judgment of Dismissal (Updated with Costs Posted per Memorandum of Costs)
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Granting Application to Exceed Page Limit - 20 pages) filed.
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Correspondence (Letter requesting continuance from 8/30/16 to 9/30/16) filed.
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Proposed Judgment filed.
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Order - Other (Stip and Order Granting Continuance from 9/8/16 to 9/30/16) filed.
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Response (to plfs Objection to defs Proposed Judgment of Dismissal) filed.
Date: 2017-05-01T00:00:00Opposition (to defs Demurrer to plfs Complaint) filed.
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Statement - Other (in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents) filed.
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed.
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs on Appeal filed.
Date: February 20, 2020Demurrer (To Complaint) filed.
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Danette E Valdez in Response to Declaration of Edward C Duckers) filed.
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Order - Other (Stip and Order Granting Leave to File aan Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Demurrer (to 1st Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Melissa Jones in Support of Defs Opposition) filed.
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Counsel in support of Plantiffs Opposition) filed.
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order - Other (To extend Time to Respond) filed.
Date: 2016-04-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Edward C Duckers Re: Compliance with Demurrer Meet & Confer Procedures) filed.
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00Reply (to plfs Motion to Compel Fruather Responses) filed.
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:003DCA Appeal not Selected Notice
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Response (to separate statement in support of opposition to plf) filed.
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Order - Other (Stip and Order to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint) filed.
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Opposition (to defs Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Plntfs Motion for Leave to Add New Cause) filed.
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Statement - Other (in support of mtn to compel) filed.
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for an Order to Extend the Time to File Oppositions) filed.
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Counsel in Support of Reply to Motion for Leave) filed.
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/23/2016 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion for Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-08-05T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Objection (to Proposed Judgment of Dismissal) filed.
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:003DCA remittitur issued, judgment is affirmed
Date: January 27, 2020Declaration - Other (of Counsel ISO Reply) filed.
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/08/2016 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Demurrer (Of NRG EnergyTo Complaint) filed.
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Reply (to SECOND Mot/Compel Further Responses to Req for Prod of Docs) filed.
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (Chevron Corporation and Chavron Power Holdings Inc) filed.
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Remittitur (Updated with Costs Posted per Memo of Costs on Appeal) filed.
Date: June 08, 2020Stipulation and Order - Other (to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint) filed.
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Counsel in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents) filed.
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (To Add New Causes of Action To 1st Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Counsel in Support of Plntfs Supplemental Opposition) filed.
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Opposition (to defs Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Danette Valdez in Support of Opposition to) filed.
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Opposition (Def Sunrise's Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First Amended) filed.
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Application - Other (for Leave to File P&A over Page Limit in Oppositions to Demurrers) filed.
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/30/2016 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to demurrer to first amended complaint) filed.
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/31/2017 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order filed.
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Melissa A Jones in support of mtn for protective order) filed.
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Add New Causes of Action to First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Response (to Separate Statement in support of Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00Opposition (To Ex Parte) filed.
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/04/2016 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion for Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Response (to plfs Supplemental Opposition to Defs Demurrers) filed.
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00Judgment filed.
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (order) filed.
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/08/2017 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Counsel in Support of Plntfs Motion) filed.
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Reply (to Motion for Leave to Add New Cause) filed.
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Melissa Jones in support of defs Opposition) filed.
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of E.Duckers) filed.
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Counsel) filed.
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of E.Duckers) filed.
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Service) filed.
Date: 2016-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order - Other (Continuing Hearing Dates on Defs Motion for Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Counsel in Support of Motion to Continue Demurrer Hearing) filed.
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Service) filed.
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Reply (Sunrise Power Company LLC) filed.
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Melissa Jones) filed.
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (Production of Documents) filed.
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Service) filed.
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Service) filed.
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Service) filed.
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Edward C Duckers Re: Meet and Confer) filed.
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Motion - Other (to Continue Demurrer Hearing Until After Discovery Motions are Resolved) filed.
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Continue Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Reply (to Motion to Continue Demurrer Hearing) filed.
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Filing
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Default
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Filing Notice of Designation and Notice to Reporters to Prepare Transcripts
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00C. Larry Davis return receipt for Supp Indices
Date: March 12, 2018Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: May 29, 2018Notice - Other (of Omitted Portions of the Recird) filed.
Date: January 16, 2018Ed Duckers return receipt for sup indices
Date: March 13, 2018Ed Duckers return receipt for RT
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:003DCA return receipt for OSF
Date: December 05, 2017Proof of Service (Declaration) filed.
Date: January 16, 20183DCA return receipt for Supp OSF
Date: March 09, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.