The Merchants National Bank Of Sacramento,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Matthew J Weber,
against
National Council On Alcoholism And Drug Dependence Inc Sacramento Region Affiliate,
Does 1-10,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Details for
The Merchants National Bank Of Sacramento v. National Council On Alcoholism And Drug Dependence Inc Sacramento Region Affiliate
, et al.
Parties for
The Merchants National Bank Of Sacramento v. National Council On Alcoholism And Drug Dependence Inc Sacramento Region Affiliate
, et al.
Plaintiffs
The Merchants National Bank Of Sacramento
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Matthew J Weber
Defendants
National Council On Alcoholism And Drug Dependence Inc Sacramento Region Affiliate
Does 1-10
Case Documents for
The Merchants National Bank Of Sacramento v. National Council On Alcoholism And Drug Dependence Inc Sacramento Region Affiliate
, et al.
Case Events for
The Merchants National Bank Of Sacramento v. National Council On Alcoholism And Drug Dependence Inc Sacramento Region Affiliate
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
May 01, 2018
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/28/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
Judge: David W. Abbott
April 26, 2018
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program Heard
Judge: David W. Abbott
April 26, 2018
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program heard on 04/26/2018 08:30:00 AM .
April 26, 2018
Docket Event
The Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program is scheduled for 01/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 39.
Judge: David W. Abbott
April 26, 2018
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/28/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Order to Show Cause in RE: Dismissal has been generated .
Judge: David W. Abbott
April 25, 2018
Docket Event
Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
April 19, 2018
Docket Event
Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 04/26/2018 08:30:00 AM published .
April 19, 2018
Tentative Ruling
Mandatory appearance of Attorney for Plaintiff or Plaintiff In Pro Per is required. Absent an Appearance for any matter on the Order to Show Cause Re: Non-Compliance could result in Dismissal without ...
Judge: David W. Abbott
February 26, 2018
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/26/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Order to Show Cause in RE: Non-Compliance has been generated .
Judge: David W. Abbott
August 18, 2016
Hearing
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program Heard