Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mid-Century Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gregg Strumwasser, against Does 1-30, Lawrence, Dandre, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2016 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1005 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time1013 days |
Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: June 06, 2016Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: October 30, 2018Complaint filed.
Date: January 29, 2016Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: October 31, 2017Summons filed.
Date: January 29, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: April 15, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.