Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Davies, Matthew R., filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Bureau Of Real Estate Department Of Consumer Affairs For The State Of California, Wayne Bell, Real Estate Commissioner, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Michael P. Kenny presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions428 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time488 days |
Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: March 09, 2017Reply (Brief in Support of Writ of Mandate) filed.
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Trial Brief (Opening Brief in Support of Writ of Mandamus) filed.
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Granting Stipulation) filed.
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Stipulation filed.
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Supplemental - Other (Respondents's Supplemental Brief Regarding the Appropriate Penalty) filed.
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - After Trial filed.
Date: March 03, 2017Davies v. Bell - Writ Petition
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate heard on 08/19/2016 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Response) filed.
Date: 2016-07-21T00:00:00Answer (to Petition) filed.
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Supplemental - Other (Brief in Support of Writ of Mandamus) filed.
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00Response (to Petitioners Brief in Support of Writ) filed.
Date: 2016-07-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate heard on 01/06/2017 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Davies v. Bureau of Real Estate - Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed.
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.
Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00Case initiation form printed .
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Hearing (on Petition for Writ of Mandamus) filed.
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Bureau of Real Estate Administrative Record Volumes 1-4) filed.
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Office of Administrative Hearings Administrative Record, Volumes 1-2) filed.
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodging filed.
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Hearing filed.
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Order After Hearing ((Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandamus)) filed.
Date: March 03, 2017Proposed Order (After Hearing) filed.
Date: March 01, 2017Order After Hearing (Peremptory Writ of Administrative Mandamus issue) filed.
Date: March 03, 2017Return to Peremptory Writ of Mandate filed.
Date: May 02, 2017Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: March 13, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.