Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Souza, Carl, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Julia V Islas, Christopher A Price, against Does 1-25, Compass Group Usa Inc, Balangue, John David, Balangue Manongdo, John David, represented by John R Meehan, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Kevin R. Culhane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin R. Culhane Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions888 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time1139 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Answer (Cross Complaint) filed.
Date: 2016-01-20T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 1) filed.
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: November 05, 2018Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: December 05, 2018Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: December 12, 2018Response (Response to order to show cause) filed.
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2015-12-23T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed.
Date: 2016-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Vacate Default) filed.
Date: September 26, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Granting Stip to Set Aside Default) filed.
Date: September 28, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.