Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Emily Pierce, against Does 1-25, Castillo, Rochelle, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with James M. Mize presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 31, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions693 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time734 days |
Minutes finalized for Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/17/2017 09:00:00 AM .
Date: February 17, 2017Proposed Order (for Judgment) filed.
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Proposed Order (Denying Motion to Dismiss) filed.
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Trial Brief (Pltf's Trial Brief) filed.
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Regarding Motion to Dismiss) filed.
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Notice - Other (Ntc Requesting and Requiring Parties to Attend Trial) filed.
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Order - Other filed.
Date: August 03, 2017Request - Judicial Notice (ISO its Opposition) filed.
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Mot/Dismiss) filed.
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss submitted by Castillo, Rochelle rejected on 01/13/2017 .
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) filed.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss filed.
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Judgment filed.
Date: June 23, 2017Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Limited Civil Case Status Memorandum filed.
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Default denied as to Castillo, Rochelle on Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) .
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Answer - (B&P 6322.1) (Rochelle Castillo's Answer to Portfolio Recovery's Complaint) filed.
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Exhibit List (Pltf's Trial Exhibit List) filed.
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Witness List filed.
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (Overnight Delivery) filed.
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Short Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/17/2017 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Declaration in Lieu of Personal Testimony Pursuant to CCP 98
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.